List of chief minister of uttarakhand
WebAmzath Basha Shaik Bepari. 11 April 2024. (351 days) YSR Congress Party. Y. S. Jaganmohan Reddy. [2] Budi Mutyala Naidu. K. Narayana Swamy. Kottu … Web6 jul. 2024 · Updated: 06 Jul 2024, 07:21 PM IST Livemint Uttarakhand Chief Minister Pushkar Singh Dhami chairs a meeting of the State Cabinet, in Dehradun 11 BJP legislators took oath as state cabinet...
List of chief minister of uttarakhand
Did you know?
WebThe longest-serving Deputy Chief Minister of India was Sushil Kumar Modi who served as Deputy Chief Minister of Bihar from Bharatiya Janata Party. As of 28 March 2024, two Indian states ( Chhattisgarh, Uttarakhand) and one union territory ( Puducherry) never had a deputy chief minister and any woman now not serving as deputy chief minister. WebThis list details chief ministers of Indian states and union territories who have served for the longest years consecutively or otherwise.. This list includes chief ministers who have served for more than 10 years in office. As of April 2024, 46 ministers have served for more than 10 years; of which only four have been female chief ministers: Sheila Dikshit …
Web15 mei 2024 · The Chief Minister of Uttarakhand is the chief executive of the Indian state of Uttarakhand which is appointed by a state’s governor. The chief minister is the … Web3 apr. 2024 · On 29th March 8 Ministers and Pushkar Singh Dhammi took an oath. Chief Minister Pushkar Singh Dhammi retained the Home Ministry, Satpal Maharaj was …
Web9 mrt. 2024 · uttarakhand new cm 2024: these five names of chief minister race in uttarakhand, know details Uttarakhand New CM 2024: उत्तराखंड में सीएम की … Web5 mrt. 2024 · The Chief Minister is the head of the party elected by the people as well as the elected state government. The Governor appoints the Chief Minister, whose Council …
Web2 dagen geleden · Saket Bahuguna, son of former Uttarakhand Chief Minister Vijay Bahuguna, and 17 other executives of financial services company Indiabulls have been …
Web18 jan. 2024 · List of Chief Ministers of Uttarakhand (2000-2024) Check below the list of all CM of Uttarakhand for the period 2000-2024: SL. No: Name of CM: Period : Party : 1. … spray painting air pressureWebChief Minister of Uttarakhand; edit. Language Label Description Also known as; English: list of Chief Ministers of Uttarakhand. Wikimedia list article. Chief Minister of Uttarakhand; Statements. instance of. position. 0 references. inception. 9 November 2000. 1 reference. imported from Wikimedia project. spray painting a ceiling fanWebTen people have served as the state's chief minister since its formation on 9 November 2000. Seven of them, including the inaugural officeholder Nityanand Swamiand the … spray painting a chandelierWebChief Ministers of Uttarakhand: From: To: Party: 1: नित्यानंद स्वामी: Nov 9, 2000: Oct 29, 2001: बी जे पी: 2: भगत ... spray painting a kitchenWebMajor General Bhuwan Chandra Khanduri (Retd.), AVSM, (born 1 October 1934) is an Indian politician. He has was Chief Minister of Uttarakhand from 2007 to 2009 and … spray painting acoustic ceiling tilesWeb3 jul. 2024 · Tirath Singh Rawat’s term as Uttarakhand Chief Minister — that lasted just 114 days — was riddled with controversies over his remarks as well as reversal of decisions taken by his predecessor Trivendra Singh Rawat who had resigned in March after leading the state government for four years. spray paint in basementWeb16 aug. 2024 · Served as Chief Minister of Uttarakhand from 11 May 2016 to 18 March 2024. 11. Trivendra Singh Rawat. He is a member of the Bharatiya Janta Party. He … spray painting a frame